Global Patent Index - EP 1050640 A9

EP 1050640 A9 2001-05-02 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürgriff

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1050640 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00109653 A

Priority

IT TO990382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050640A2] A handle (1) for a vehicle door has a supporting structure (2); a transmission lever (20) activated externally by means of a control member (16) to rotate between an angular rest position, and an angular work position to open a lock on the door; and a safety locking device (30) for keeping the lever (20) in the rest position in the event of lateral impact on the vehicle; the device (30) has a fixed appendix (9) integral with the structure (2), a movable appendix (27) integral with the lever (20), and a pendulum-type inertial body (31) hinged to the structure (2) about an axis (15) and having an end tongue (37) for making the appendixes (9, 27) integral with each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); B60R 21/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/02 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/06 (2013.01)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050640 A2 20001108; EP 1050640 A3 20010321; EP 1050640 A9 20010502; EP 1050640 B1 20061011; DE 60031195 D1 20061123; DE 60031195 T2 20070809; ES 2273632 T3 20070516; IT 1309803 B1 20020130; IT TO990382 A1 20001107; IT TO990382 D0 19990507; JP 2001012114 A 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-25 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60031195

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-29 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VALEO S.P.A.

2011-03-01 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60031195

2011-03-01 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60031195

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH. & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273632 T3

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031195 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-05-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO S.P.A.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 65/20 A, 7E 05B 7/00 B, 7E 05B 65/12 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI