Global Patent Index - EP 1050644 A2

EP 1050644 A2 2000-11-08 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürgriff

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1050644 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109651 A

Priority

IT TO990379 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle door handle (1) has a transmission lever (21) activated externally by means of a control lever (16) to rotate, about a hinge axis (15), between an angular rest position, and an angular work position to open a lock on the door; and an inertial member (39), which keeps the transmission lever (21) in the rest position in the event of lateral impact on the vehicle, rotates about the axis (15) with respect to the transmission lever (21), and has an inertial mass (42) located eccentrically with respect to the axis (15), and a one-way angular locking device (57) enabling the mass (42) to rotate, together with the transmission lever (21), in one rotation direction, so as to exert a balancing force, in the event of lateral impact, to balance the inertial forces tending to move the lever (21) into the work position, and to rotate freely with respect to the lever (21) in the opposite direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 7/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050644 A2 20001108; EP 1050644 A3 20010321; EP 1050644 A9 20010502; EP 1050644 B1 20060215; DE 60025970 D1 20060420; DE 60025970 T2 20061102; ES 2258424 T3 20060901; IT 1309800 B1 20020130; IT TO990379 A1 20001107; IT TO990379 D0 19990507; JP 2001132282 A 20010515; JP 4629187 B2 20110209

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: U-SHIN ITALIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20160427

2016-04-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160317 AND 20160323

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258424 T3

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025970 P 20060420

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-05-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO S.P.A.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI