Global patent index - EP 1050646 A1

EP 1050646 A1 2000-11-08 - Locking device for a motor vehicle side door and vehicle equipped with such a device

Title (en)

Locking device for a motor vehicle side door and vehicle equipped with such a device

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für eine Seitentür eines Kraftfahrzeuges und Kraftfahrzeug mit einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture pour une portière latérale de véhicule automobile et véhicule équipé de ce dispositif

Publication

EP 1050646 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401157 A

Priority

FR 9905636 A

Abstract (en)

The catch for the side door of a car consists of a rotating locking plate (12) and a clip (15) which locks it over a pin (11 fixed to the car bodywork. the catch is opened by a door handle (18) connected by a cable (17) to a pin (15b) on the clip. A loc button (6) mounted in a reinforced section (24) of the door is connected by a rod (22) to a control lever (20). This cooperates the outer surface (26) of the locking plate and keeps the button down when the locking plate is freed from the locking pin (11)

Abstract (fr)

L' invention concerne un dispositif de fermeture pour une portière latérale (P) de véhicule automobile (V), comportant une serrure (7) destinée à être fixée sur ladite portière, ladite serrure contenant un pêne rotatif (12) et un cliquet rotatif (15) de blocage du pêne dans sa position de rétention d'une gâche (11) fixée à la caisse du véhicule, et des moyens (17, 19) de déclenchement d'ouverture de la serrure aptes à coopérer avec le cliquet pour le déplacer en position de libération du pêne sous l'action d'un organe (18) de commande d'ouverture intérieur ou extérieur de la portière. Ce dispositif comporte au moins un organe de retenue escamotable (6) destiné à être monté sur ladite portière (P), pour s'engager dans un renforcement (24) prévu sur la caisse du véhicule, ledit organe escamotable étant relié par un moyen de liaison (13, 22) à une biellette de commande (20, 120) qui coopère avec le pêne (12) précité, pour maintenir ledit organe de retenue en position escamotée lorsque le pêne est dans sa position de libération de la gâche (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 65/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/22 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/38 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 85/22 (2013.01); E05B 85/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050646 A1 20001108; EP 1050646 B1 20050302; DE 60018324 D1 20050407; DE 60018324 T2 20060112; ES 2238977 T3 20050916; FR 2793275 A1 20001110; FR 2793275 B1 20010629

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60018324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070427

2006-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060407

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2238977

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030926

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI