Global Patent Index - EP 1050649 A1

EP 1050649 A1 2000-11-08 - Magnetic closure

Title (en)

Magnetic closure

Title (de)

Magnetverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture magnétique

Publication

EP 1050649 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109325 A

Priority

DE 19920934 A

Abstract (en)

The magnetic fastening has a magnet (11) to which adheres a bolt part (13) which is brought to at least two positions by mea of an displacement mechanism. The bolt part in the first adjusted position rests flat against one or more surfaces of the magnet fo by two pole-plates. In the second position the bolt part is partially folded away from the magnetic surface or from part of the magnets surface. The bolt part has a lever with handle (18) at the join with the magnet. The bolt part is swivel fixed to a fitm (20) which has a spring element (17).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Magnetverschluß mit einem Magneten, einem an den Magneten magnetisch anheftbaren Riegelteil und einem Verstellmechanismus, wobei das Riegelteil mittels des Verstellmechanismus gegenüber dem Magneten in wenigstens zwei Stellpositionen anordenbar ist, und wobei das Riegelteil in der ersten Stellposition an einer oder mehreren Magnetflächen des Magneten flächig anliegt. Um eine kraftsparendes Lösen der Magnetverbindung zu ermöglichen, wobei gleichzeitig nur kleine Verstellwege des Verstellmechanismusses erforderlich sind, ist es erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß das Riegelteil in der zweiten Stellposition von der Magnetfläche teilweise oder einem Teil der Magnetflächen abklappbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2455520 A1 19760526 - COCKBURN GORDON

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050649 A1 20001108; DE 19920934 A1 20001116; DE 19920934 C2 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050125

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030811

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI