Global Patent Index - EP 1050650 A2

EP 1050650 A2 2000-11-08 - Mounting plate for furniture hinges

Title (en)

Mounting plate for furniture hinges

Title (de)

Montageplatte für Möbelscharniere

Title (fr)

Plaque de montage pour charnières de meubles

Publication

EP 1050650 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106911 A

Priority

DE 19920137 A

Abstract (en)

The hinge-mounting plate comprises a base plate (1) in two parts, with a bottom part (2) fixable to the main furniture body, a top part (3) clamped to the bottom part. The adjusting plate and the top part are connected at at least three suspension point a result of pressure applied to the adjusting plate in relation to the base plate. The connection is secured against slippage by means of a spring element (6) on the adjusting plate. The front end of the bottom part has a notch (4), and the back end has a spigot (6) resting against slopes (5,8) on the top part.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Montageplatte für Möbelscharnier einer am Möbelkorpus befestigten Grundplatte und einer mit der Grundplatte verbindbaren das Möbelscharnier tragende Stellplatte, wobei zur Festlegung der Verbindung eine Rastverbindung vorgesehen ist. Um eine stabilere Verbindung bei gleichzeitig leichter Montage zu erzielen, zeichnet sich die Erfindung dadurch aus, daß die Grundplatte zweiteilig ausgebildet ist, mit einem am Möbelkorpus befestigbaren Unterteil und einem mit dem Unterteil verspannbaren Oberteil wobei die Stellplatte und das Oberteil bei Druck auf die Stellplatte aufgrund einer durch geeignete Mittel erzwungenen Verschiebebewegung der Stellplatte relativ zur Grundplatte durch mindestens drei Einhängemittel miteinander verbindbar sind, und die Verbindung über ein an der Stellplatte angeordnetes Federelement gegen weiteres Verschieben gesichert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/125 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53235 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5324 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53257 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5358 (2013.01); Y10T 16/554 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19707741 A1 19980903 - GRASS AG [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050650 A2 20001108; EP 1050650 A3 20020130; EP 1050650 B1 20051214; AT 312993 T 20051215; DE 19920137 A1 20001116; DE 19920137 C2 20021128; DE 50011842 D1 20060119; US 2002166207 A1 20021114; US 6339864 B1 20020122; US 6698062 B2 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 312993 T

- Effective date: 20140331

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011842

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070202

2007-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011842 P 20060119

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2005-12-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI