Global patent index - EP 1050651 A2

EP 1050651 A2 2000-11-08 - Door hinge for furniture, in particular for office use and the like

Title (en)

Door hinge for furniture, in particular for office use and the like

Title (de)

Türscharnier für Möbel, insbesondere für Bürozwecke und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Charnière de porte pour meuble, en particulier pour bureaux et similaires

Publication

EP 1050651 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201562 A

Priority

IT MI990948 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a hinge for office furniture, in which a lever arm (5) pivoting relative to a fixed pin (9) is locked in a cage (10) fitted to the door (2) of the item of furniture, by means of a snap-engagement system. More specifically, this system comprises a spring (23) made from a steel piano wire mounted on a coupling body (20) having a flattened form which, in turn, is secured to the lever arm. Advantageously, the spring engages with a coupling tooth (19) present on the cage (10), bending in a plane parallel to the coupling body: thus, a hinge is obtained which is easy to assemble and disassemble and which has a reduced thickness. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/08; E05D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/123 (2013.01); E05D 5/08 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050651 A2 20001108; EP 1050651 A3 20020313; IT 1312290 B1 20020410; IT MI990948 A1 20001106

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020914

2003-01-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05D 5/08 A, 7E 05D 7/12 B, 7E 05D 7/04 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI