Global Patent Index - EP 1050653 A2

EP 1050653 A2 2000-11-08 - Fitting for pivotally mounting a wing of a window or door

Title (en)

Fitting for pivotally mounting a wing of a window or door

Title (de)

Beschlag zur Drehlagerung eines Fenster- oder Türflügels

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour montage pivotant d'un vantail de fenêtre ou de porte

Publication

EP 1050653 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108468 A

Priority

DE 29907934 U

Abstract (en)

The fixture is for the rotary location of a window pane or door panel (1) in the area of the upper corner on an arch frame ( A support arm (10) is provided above the upper rabbet horizontal surface of the pane or panel and at its bearing-side end is conne with the movable bearing part (30) of a rotary bearing fixed to the pane or panel. There is an anchoring part (20) on the upper horizontal rabbet surface, with which the support arm is connected at its end remote from the bearing part. The connection has an adjustment device with a positioning screw (50), which makes possible a horizontal adjustment of the support arm in its longitudinal direction relative to the anchoring part.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag zur Drehlagerung eines Fenster- oder Türflügels (1) im Bereich seiner oberen Ecke hat einen mit dem Drehlager verbundenen Tragarm (10), der sich über der oberen horizontalen Falzfläche des Flügels erstreckt und mit diesem verbunden ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Tragarm (10) mit einer auf der Falzfläche (7) des Flügels (1) befestigten Stulpschiene (20) verbunden, und zwar mittels eines am Ende des Tragarms vorgesehenen pilzartigen Verbindungsteils (40), dessen Erweiterung (45) die Stulpschiene (20) untergreift. In einer Gewindebohrung (43) des Verbindungsteils (40) ist eine Stellschraube (50) aufgenommen, mit der der Tragarm (10) relativ zur Stulpschiene (20) horizontal verstellt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5205 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29717177 U1 19990204 - FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907934 U1 20000914; EP 1050653 A2 20001108; EP 1050653 A3 20041117

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071031

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI