Global Patent Index - EP 1050658 A3

EP 1050658 A3 2003-06-04 - Plastic straight connector for spacer profiles of insulating glazing

Title (en)

Plastic straight connector for spacer profiles of insulating glazing

Title (de)

Linearverbinder aus Kunststoff für Abstandhalterprofile von Mehrscheibenisoliergläsern

Title (fr)

Raccord rectigligne en matière plastique pour profilés intercalaires de vitrages isolants

Publication

EP 1050658 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107550 A

Priority

  • DE 29907938 U
  • DE 29918002 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6398449B1] A linear connector for joining metal spacing profiles for multiple insulated glass panes, includes a body that is adapted to be inserted into the hollow spaces of two spacing profiles. The body has a pair of brake blades positioned along lateral sides that are inclined toward the center. The brake blades are adapted to contact opposing front faces of the profile bodies upon insertion of the linear connector into the spacing profile. Spring blades project from the lateral sides of the body. The spring blades are positioned behind one another to form a V-configuration and are adapted to increase the frictional force between the body and the inner wall surfaces of the spacing profiles. Reinforcing elements, that are centrally positioned along lateral sides of the body, are connected to the said brake blades and are adapted to prevent passage of hygroscopic powder along the outside of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2013.01); Y10T 403/4949 (2013.01); Y10T 403/55 (2013.01); Y10T 403/5793 (2013.01); Y10T 403/75 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6398449 B1 20020604; EP 1050658 A2 20001108; EP 1050658 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI