Global Patent Index - EP 1050669 A2

EP 1050669 A2 2000-11-08 - Valve driving arrangement with variable lift for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve driving arrangement with variable lift for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Betätigung eines Ventiles mit variablem Hub an Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de soupape à levée variable pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1050669 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108823 A

Priority

DE 19920512 A

Abstract (en)

The device is operating a valve with variable lift in an internal combustion engine. Two revolving and adjustable camshafts involved together with a valve activated by a closure spring, an axial tappet acting on the valve shaft end and an operating lev activated by both camshafts and affecting the cup tappet. The first camshaft (1) is arranged above the tappet (8) and is provided with an operating cam (4). The second camshaft (2) arranged above the first camshaft and is provided with an adjustment cam (13). The operating lever (14) is pivotably located at first end point (15) on the tappet and supports pivotably with the other end point (16) on a bearing (17) of a connecting part ( Centrally, the operating lever is in effective connection with the operating cam (4) of the first camshaft. The connecting part extends crossways between the two camshafts and supports a roller (22) at its end opposite to the bearing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Betätigung eines Ventils mit variablem Hub an Brennkraftmaschinen. Die Vorrichtung umfaßt zwei gegeneinander verstellbare Nockenwellen (1, 2), ein von einer Schließfeder (12) beaufschlagtes Ventil, einen Tassenstößel (8) sowie einen von beiden Nockenwellen (1, 2) beaufschlagten Betätigungshebel (14), der die Nockenwege addiert. Um mit möglichst geringem Bauraum auszukommen und die Vorrichtung auch an üblichen Zylinderköpfen installieren zu können, wird vorgeschlagen, den Betätigungshebel (14) auf dem Tassenstößel (8) schwenkbar zu lagern und andererseits an einem Verbindungsteil (18) abzustützen, das sich zwischen den beiden Nockenwellen (1, 2) erstreckt und mit einer Rolle (22) auf einem Rastkreis (5) der ersten Nockenwelle sowie einem Stellnocken (13) der zweiten Nockenwelle anliegt. Ein Betätigungsnocken (4) der ersten Nockenwelle (1) wirkt auf den Betätigungshebel (14) ein. Durch Verstellen der Nockenwellen (1, 2) gegeneinander kann so ein Ventilhub zwischen Null und einem Maximum eingestellt werden. Die Vorrichtung erfordert relativ geringen Raum und ist auf übliche Zylinderköpfe adaptierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/14; F01L 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 1/143 (2013.01); F01L 13/0047 (2013.01); F01L 2105/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3519319 A1 19861204 - PORSCHE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050669 A2 20001108; EP 1050669 A3 20010516; EP 1050669 B1 20050126; DE 19920512 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130426

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009324

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, US

- Document: DE 50009324

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, MICH., US

- Document: DE 50009324

- Effective date: 20110323

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009324 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-01-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011103

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI