Global Patent Index - EP 1050677 A3

EP 1050677 A3 2001-12-19 - Method for making a split engine housing

Title (en)

Method for making a split engine housing

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines geteilten Maschinengehäuses

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un bâtiment-moteur en plusieurs parties

Publication

EP 1050677 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107622 A

Priority

DE 19920097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1050677A2] The divided machine housing has a shaft sealing ring (5) inserted on at least one face side through which the shaft is exten outwards. In the dividing plane (3) in at least one of the machine housing parts (1) a groove (7) accommodates the sealing mediu the outside of the shaft sealing ring. The groove in the shaft sealing ring runs screw-fashion. In the shaft sealing ring, grooves (7') running in the direction o the shaft axis (9) are provided in the dividing plane (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F02B 77/00; F02F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/00 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0053 (2013.01); F02B 77/00 (2013.01); F02F 7/008 (2013.01); F02F 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050677 A2 20001108; EP 1050677 A3 20011219; EP 1050677 B1 20050713; DE 19920097 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010691 P 20050818

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041122

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI