Global Patent Index - EP 1050680 A2

EP 1050680 A2 2000-11-08 - Shaft seal for hydraulic machine

Title (en)

Shaft seal for hydraulic machine

Title (de)

Wellendichtung für hydraulische Maschine

Title (fr)

Joint d'arbre pour machine hydraulique

Publication

EP 1050680 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109429 A

Priority

DE 19921501 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a housing (2) in which a rotatable drive shaft (5) fits through a wall (2a) hole (8). A roller bearing (7) i located on the housing wall, on which an external primary sealing component (9) is fitted. In the space between the primary seal component and the roller bearing a second sealing component (26) is fitted, which divides the space into an inner area (3a) accommodating the roller bearing and intermediate space (27) between the primary and secondary sealing components. The intermedi space is connected with a drainage conduit (31), in which a pressure appertains, which is lower than that in the inner area (3a)

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine hydraulische Maschine (1), insbesondere Kolbenmaschine, mit einem Gehäuse (2), in dem eine Triebwelle (5) drehbar gelagert ist, die eine Gehäusewand (2a) in einem Durchführungsloch (8) durchsetzt und durch ein Wälzlager (7) an der Gehäusewand (2a) gelagert sowie durch ein außenseitig vom Wälzlager (7) angeordnetes erstes Dichtelement (9) abgedichtet ist. Zwecks Verbesserung der Abdichtung der Triebwelle (5) ist in dem sich zwischen dem ersten Dichtelement (9) und dem Wälzlager (7) erstreckenden Raum ein zweites Dichtelement (26) angeordnet, das den Raum in einen das Wälzlager (7) aufnehmenden Innenraum (3a) und einen zwischen dem ersten Dichtelement (9) und dem zweiten Dichtelement (26) angeordneten Zwischenraum (27) trennt, wobei der Zwischenraum (27) mit einer Drainageleitung (31) verbunden ist, in der ein Druck herrscht, der niedriger ist als der Druck im Innenraum (3a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/12 (2006.01); F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 53/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2014 (2013.01); F04B 1/122 (2013.01); F04B 1/2085 (2013.01); F04B 53/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19613609 A1 19971009 - BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050680 A2 20001108; EP 1050680 A3 20010328; EP 1050680 B1 20051019; DE 19921501 A1 20001116; DE 19921501 C2 20030508; DE 50011350 D1 20060302

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011350

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140503

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140504

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140503

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011350 P 20060302

2006-02-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031027

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/12 A, 7F 04B 1/20 B, 7F 04B 53/04 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI