Global Patent Index - EP 1050683 A2

EP 1050683 A2 2000-11-08 - Fan hub

Title (en)

Fan hub

Title (de)

Lüfternabe

Title (fr)

Moyeu de ventilateur

Publication

EP 1050683 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500042 A

Priority

ES 9900943 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement is formed by the combination of a number of standardised parts such as a sleeve, a back half casing and a front half casing, both being generally equal to one another and having a semicylindrical configuration with no upper base. From the edge thereof a flap is formed provided with a number of openings and flanges located at the side surface thereof. Said half casings may be coupled through clamping means provided at the base thereof by combining bores, rods and nuts tightly clamping them in such a way that the skirt of said blades is located therein, which blades are manufactured in a conventional way. However, said base is provided with such a skirt which finishes at the only free end thereof in a ringed rim. The skirt and the rim are accommodated in a bracket which is clamped between the above mentioned back and front half casings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/36; F04D 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/32 (2006.01); F04D 29/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/329 (2013.01); F04D 29/34 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050683 A2 20001108; EP 1050683 A3 20021009; ES 2156818 A1 20010716; ES 2156818 B1 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI