Global Patent Index - EP 1050710 A2

EP 1050710 A2 2000-11-08 - Signal lamp for vehicle

Title (en)

Signal lamp for vehicle

Title (de)

Signalleuchte für Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation de véhicule

Publication

EP 1050710 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00401223 A

Priority

FR 9905788 A

Abstract (en)

Indicator comprises socket (1) supporting lamp (2) and reflector (3). Reflector is used to send back parallel beams from lam toward screen (4). Indicator has mirror (6) with parallel colored rods (7) defining gaps (10). Shield (8) is placed in front of lamp, and has inner face, towards lamp, equipped with Fresnel lens (9).

Abstract (fr)

Feu de signalisation de véhicule du type comprenant une lampe (2), un réflecteur (3), un écran (4) et une glace (6), la glace (6) présentant, sur sa face tournée vers l'écran (4), une série de barreaux colorés parallèles noyés, en partie, dans une épaisseur de matière plastique incolore constituant la glace afin de ménager,entre les paires de barreaux adjacents, des intervalles (10), l'écran comportant une optique propre à canaliser les rayons lumineux émis par la lampe vers les intervalles (10), ledit feu étant caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte une bonnette (8) disposée devant la lampe et comportant une lentille de Fresnel (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/2212 (2013.01); F21S 48/2218 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050710 A2 20001108; EP 1050710 A3 20001213; FR 2793302 A1 20001110; FR 2793302 B1 20010706

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101109

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR LAMPS FRANCE

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR FRANCE

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI