Global Patent Index - EP 1050713 A1

EP 1050713 A1 2000-11-08 - Method for suppressing respectively controlling thermoacoustic vibrations in a combustion chamber as well as combustion chamber for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for suppressing respectively controlling thermoacoustic vibrations in a combustion chamber as well as combustion chamber for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Unterdrückung bzw. Kontrolle von thermoakustischen Schwingungen in einem Verbrennungssystem sowie Verbrennungssystem zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de suppression respectivement de contrôle de vibrations thermoacoustiques dans une chambre de combustion ainsi que chambre de combustion pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1050713 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810369 A

Priority

DE 19928226 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves detecting the oscillations in a closed control loop (24') and generating acoustic oscillations of a defi amplitude and phase depending on the detected oscillations for coupling into the combustion system. The amplitude of the generat acoustic oscillations is selected within the control loop in proportion to the amplitude of the detected oscillations. An Independent claim is also included for a combustion system for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Unterdrückung bzw. Kontrolle von thermoakustischen Schwingungen, welche in einem Verbrennungssystem mit einem in eine Brennkammer (12) arbeitenden Brenner (11) durch Ausbildung kohärenter bzw. Wirbelstrukturen und einer damit verbundenen periodischen Wärmefreisetzung entstehen, bei welchem Verfahren in einer geschlossenen Regelschleife (24') die Schwingungen detektiert und in Abhängigkeit von den detektierten Schwingungen akustische Schwingungen einer bestimmten Amplitude und Phase erzeugt und in das Verbrennungssystem (10) eingekoppelt werden, wird eine verbesserte Unterdrückung dadurch erreicht, das innerhalb der Regelschleife (24') die Amplitude der erzeugten akustischen Schwingungen proportional zur Amplitude der detektierten Schwingungen gewählt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 20/005 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00013 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 5145355 A 19920908 - POINSOT THIERRY [FR], et al
  • US 5428951 A 19950704 - WILSON KENNETH [US], et al
  • GUTMARK E, WEISENSTEIN W.: "Structure and Control of Thermoacoustic Instabilities in a Gas-Turbine Combustor", 36TH AIAA, AEROSPACE SCIENCE MEETING AND EXHIBIT, 12 January 1998 (1998-01-12) - 15 January 1998 (1998-01-15), RENO, NEVADA

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4557106 A 19851210 - FFOWCS WILLIAMS JOHN E [GB], et al
  • [PA] EP 0918152 A1 19990526 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [DA] PASCHEREIT C.O.: "structure and control of thermoacoustic instabilities in a gas-turbine combustor", COMBUSTION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 138, no. 1-6, September 1998 (1998-09-01), pages 213 - 232, XP002142707

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050713 A1 20001108; EP 1050713 B1 20030813; DE 19928226 A1 20010201; US 6461144 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003241 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI