Global Patent Index - EP 1050716 A1

EP 1050716 A1 2000-11-08 - Glow plug and method for producing the same

Title (en)

Glow plug and method for producing the same

Title (de)

Glühkerze und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence et son procédé de production

Publication

EP 1050716 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108176 A

Priority

DE 19920758 A

Abstract (en)

The glow plug has a heating rod with an internal pole connected to heating and possibly control elements and an outer pole, whereby the outer pole is the wall of a heating rod (2), which is electrically isolated from touching components of the plug bod (1). The body is made of electrically insulating synthetic material. The insulation is provided by a coating of insulating synth material on the heating rod or on the wall of a bore in the body. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a glow plug.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Glühkerze mit einem Heizstab, in den ein Innenpol, verbunden mit Heiz- und ggf. Regelelementen, führt, und einem Außenpol, wobei der Außenpol die Wandung des von anliegenden Bauteilen des Kerzenkörpers elektrisch isolierten Heizstabes (2) ist, und der Körper (1) aus elektrisch isolierendem Kunststoffmaterial besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01); F02P 19/028 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/002 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4475029 A 19841002 - YOSHIDA HITOSHI [JP], et al
  • [X] DE 4117253 A1 19911212 - JIDOSHA KIKI CO [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 257 (M - 256) 16 November 1983 (1983-11-16)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 311 (M - 851) 17 July 1989 (1989-07-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050716 A1 20001108; EP 1050716 B1 20030813; AT 247257 T 20030815; DE 19920758 C1 20001221; ES 2204391 T3 20040501; JP 2000337633 A 20001208; US 6255626 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003242

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003242

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110414

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110414

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110413

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110413

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110413

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247257 T

- Effective date: 20110413

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110413

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-04-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204391 T3

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003242 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENDLER, MAX

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALLGAIER, MARTIN

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAUSSNER, MICHAEL

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMITZ, HEINZ-GEORG

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WYRWICH, ULF

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREBE, REINHOLD

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KASIMIRSKI,HANS-PETER

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELLER, MARTIN

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI