Global Patent Index - EP 1050721 A1

EP 1050721 A1 2000-11-08 - Heat exchanger for a water heater

Title (en)

Heat exchanger for a water heater

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher für einen Heizkessel

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur destiné à équiper une chaudière à eau chaude

Publication

EP 1050721 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420089 A

Priority

FR 9905812 A

Abstract (en)

The water boiler heat exchanger has tubes (10) circulating coolant liquid near a burner. The tubes have circular cross-secti at ends, near tubular plates (not shown). In the center, each tube has a pentagonal cross-section. Transition zone (18) occurs betw pentagonal and circular cross-sections. Pentagonal section has large base (20), two lateral walls (22), and two top walls (24). is oriented towards burner.

Abstract (fr)

Cet échangeur de chaleur comporte au moins une nape de tubes (8, 10) disposés à proximité d'un brûleur. Le tube (10) présente à proximité de ses extrémités une première section transversale, de préférence circulaire, tandis qu'à distance de ses extrémités il présente une section transversale distincte, de préférence sensiblement polygonale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/40; F28F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/40 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F24H 1/403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050721 A1 20001108; FR 2793313 A1 20001110; FR 2793313 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030204

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI