Global patent index - EP 1050722 A3

EP 1050722 A3 2001-01-03 - Device for facilitating the dismounting of a radiator

Title (en)

Device for facilitating the dismounting of a radiator

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erleichterung der Demontage eines Warmwasserheizkörpers

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faciliter la démontage d'un radiateur

Publication

EP 1050722 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108447 A

Priority

  • DE 29907852 U
  • DE 29909478 U
  • DE 29915214 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10019354A1] The screw-in socket with integrated valve (1) can also be located between the valve heating body and the back flow screw formation (5) in forward flow (4) and back flow (6). Further alternative arrangements are for the screw-in socket with integrated valve to be located between the valve heating body and the tap block in forward and back flow or between the valve heating body with Euro cone and the tap block in forward and back flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0012 (2013.01); F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10019354 A1 20001109; EP 1050722 A2 20001108; EP 1050722 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI