Global Patent Index - EP 1050723 A2

EP 1050723 A2 2000-11-08 - Refrigeration system and method for operating a refrigeration system

Title (en)

Refrigeration system and method for operating a refrigeration system

Title (de)

Kälteanlage und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kälteanlage

Title (fr)

Système frigorifique et procédé de fonctionnement d'un système frigorifique

Publication

EP 1050723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109559 A

Priority

DE 19920734 A

Abstract (en)

The refrigeration installation has at least one refrigeration circuit and at least one freezer circuit with at least one 2-s compressor, the circuits coupled together via a coupling line (20) connecting the suction side of the refrigeration circuit with intermediate pressure side of the freezer circuit. An Independent claim for an operating method for a refrigeration installation is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kälteanlage mit wenigstens einem Normalkühlkreislauf und wenigstens einem Tiefkühlkreislauf, wobei die Kreisläufe miteinander verschaltet und lediglich ein Verflüssiger vorgesehen ist und der Tiefkühlkreislauf eine wenigstens zweistufige Verdichtereinheit aufweist, sowie ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer derartigen Kälteanlage. Erfindungsgemäß steht die Saugseite des Normalkühlkreislaufes mit der oder einer der Zwischendruckseiten des Tiefkühlkreislaufes in Wirkverbindung; dies wird vorzugsweise mittels wenigstens einer Verbindungsleitung (20) realisiert. Sofern zumindest einer Verdichterstufe des Normalkühlkreislaufes und einer Verdichterstufe des Tiefkühlkreislaufes, wobei es sich nicht um die erste Verdichterstufe handelt, Saugsammelbehälter (S2, S4) vorgeschaltet sind, stehen diese miteinander in Wirkverbindung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 1/10; F25B 5/02; F25B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/10 (2006.01); F25B 5/02 (2006.01); F25B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 5/02 (2013.01); F25B 1/10 (2013.01); F25B 41/04 (2013.01); F25B 2400/075 (2013.01); F25B 2400/16 (2013.01); F25B 2400/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050723 A2 20001108; EP 1050723 A3 20020814; EP 1050723 B1 20070103; AT 350629 T 20070115; DE 19920734 A1 20001109; DE 50013917 D1 20070215; ES 2280159 T3 20070916

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130505

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130504

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130504

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130504

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 350629 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-07-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Document: AT 350629 T

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOCH, KLAUS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARRIER CORPORATION, FARMINGTON, US

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20121213

2013-02-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20121004

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120517

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120726 AND 20120801

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-06 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: CARRIER KAELTETECHNIK DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH, 50999 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARRIER KAELTETECHNIK DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 50999 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOCH, KLAUS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH, 50999 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOCH, KLAUS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CARRIER KAELTETECHNIK DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, 50999 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013917

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE MEINKE, DABRINGHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-05-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20120416

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070504

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH#SUERTHER HAUPTSTRASSE 173#50999 KOELN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH#SUERTHER HAUPTSTRASSE 173#50999 KOELN (DE)

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LINDE KALTETECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2280159 T3

2007-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-06-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2007-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013917 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH & CO.KG

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI