Global patent index - EP 1050736 A2

EP 1050736 A2 2000-11-08 - Fighting vehicle, in particular a tank

Title (en)

Fighting vehicle, in particular a tank

Title (de)

Kampffahrzeug, insbesondere Kampfpanzer

Title (fr)

Véhicule de combat, en particulier char d'assaut

Publication

EP 1050736 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109213 A

Priority

DE 19921294 A

Abstract (en)

On the vehicle bodywork a rotary turret is installed, in which a large calibre main weapon pivotable in elevation is located The main weapon (1) is of the electro-thermal chemical type and the electrical components for feed of energy to it are distributed o the turret (T) and vehicle bodywork (R). A pulse energy accumulator (4,16) is connected with the ignition unit of the weapon and an energy buffer accumulator (6) is connected with an electric generator (17) driven by the internal combustion engine (26).

Abstract (de)

Ein Kampffahrzeug, insbesondere ein Kampfpanzer mit einem Fahrzeugrumpf (R), in dessen Heckbereich die Antriebsvorrichtung für das Kettenfahrwerk (F) derart angeordnet ist, daß sie im wesentlichen auf einer Fahrzeugseite liegt, so daß auf der anderen Fahrzeugseite ein nutzbarer Freiraum vorhanden ist und am Fahrzeugheck im Bereich dieses Freiraums eine Ein/Ausstiegsluke (31) angeordnet ist. Auf dem Fahrzeugrumpf (R) ist ein drehbarer Turm (T) angeordnet, in dem eine großkalibrige Hauptwaffe (1) gelagert ist. Die Hauptwaffe (1) ist als ETC-Waffe ausgebildet. Die elektrischen Komponenten zur Zuführung von elektrischer Energie zur ETC-Waffe sind auf Turm (T) und Fahrzeugrumpf (R) verteilt. Sie besitzen einen Pulsenergiespeicher (4), der im Turm in unmittelbarer Nähe der ETC-Waffe (1) angeordnet ist und der über einen Energiepufferspeicher (6) mit einem vom Verbrennungsmotor (26) angetriebenen und in dessen Nähe angeordenten elektrischen Generator (17) verbunden ist. Die Übertragung der elektrischen Energie von den im Fahrzeugrumpf angeordneten elektrischen Komponenten zu den im Turm angeordneten elektrischen Komponenten erfolgt mittels eines Schleifringübertragers (10). Der Energiepufferspeicher (6) kann dem Schleifringübertrager (10) vor- oder nachgeschaltet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19717734 A1 19981029 - WEGMANN & CO GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050736 A2 20001108; EP 1050736 A3 20020213; DE 19921294 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021109

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL SE

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI