Global patent index - EP 1050784 A1

EP 1050784 A1 2000-11-08 - Timepiece with means for determining the angular position of analog display coaxial indicators

Title (en)

Timepiece with means for determining the angular position of analog display coaxial indicators

Title (de)

Uhr mit Mittel zur Ermittlung der Winkelstellung der koaxialen Zeiger einer analogen Anzeige

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie comprenant des moyens de repérage de la position angulaire d'indicateurs coaxiaux d'affichage analogique

Publication

EP 1050784 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99108958 A

Priority

EP 99108958 A

Abstract (en)

Clockwork comprises first and second coaxial rotative display indicators (5, 6) respectively linked to corresponding coaxial canons (1, 2). First canon (5) defines first position locating mobile (MR1), and has first magnetic or capacitive sensor (11) for angular location associated to first mobile. Second canon (6) defines second position locating mobile (MR2) with second magnetic or capacitive sensor (20) associated to it.

Abstract (fr)

Un premier (5) des indicateurs et un premier canon (1) forment partie d'un mobile de repérage de position angulaire (MR1) portant un plateau (9) coopérant avec un premier capteur (11) destiné à engendrer un signal de position de cet indicateur grâce à des discontinuités de matière de ce plateau. Un second indicateur d'affichage (6) coaxial au premier indicateur est couplé à un second mobile de repérage de position angulaire (MR2). Celui-ci, monté à l'écart du premier mobile est en relation d'engrènement avec un second canon (2) portant ce second indicateur. Ce second mobile porte un second plateau (18) coopérant avec un second capteur (20), destiné à engendrer un signal de position de ce second indicateur grâce à des discontinuités de matière de ce second plateau. Les plateaux (9, 18) et les capteurs (11, 20) peuvent ainsi être disposés respectivement côte-à-côte réduisant ainsi la hauteur à la superposition d'un plateau et d'un capteur seulement pour repérer indépendamment les positions angulaires des premier et second indicateurs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 9/02; G04D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/14 (2006.01); G04D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 7/1207 (2013.01); G04C 3/008 (2013.01); G04C 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050784 A1 20001108; EP 1050784 B1 20100428; DE 69942303 D1 20100610

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130506

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130506

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100428

2010-06-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69942303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-06-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2010-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2010-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2010-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071218

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI