Global Patent Index - EP 1050855 A1

EP 1050855 A1 2000-11-08 - Method for detecting a magnetic identifier of a test object

Title (en)

Method for detecting a magnetic identifier of a test object

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Detektieren einer magnetischen Kennung eines Prüfobjektes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour détecter un identificateur magnétique d'un objet à tester

Publication

EP 1050855 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810393 A

Priority

EP 99810393 A

Abstract (en)

The device detects a magnetic identification for a test object (3) transported along a transport path (2) using a number of magnetic field sensors extending across the full width (B) of the transport path, combined with at least one magnetization devic (10,11), also extending across the full width of the transport path, in a common module (1). An Independent claim for an automatic banknote checking device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Detektieren eines mit einer magnetischen Kennung (12) versehenen, auf einer Transportbahn (2) geführten Prüfobjektes (3) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass eine möglichst grosse Anzahl von Magnetfeldsensoren (5.1, ..., 5.N; 6.1, ..., 6.N) in einer sich über eine ganze Breite der Transportbahn) erstreckenden Baueinheit (1) zusammen mit den sich ebenfalls über die ganze Breite erstreckenden Magnetisierungsmittel untergebracht sind. Die Magnetfeldsensoren sind chipförmige Hallsensoren, die in regelmässigen Abständen auf mindestens einer, vorzugsweise zwei geraden Linien (7, 8) quer zur Transportrichtung angeordnet. Die Vorrichtung eignet sich insbesondere für Banknoten-Erkennungsautomaten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050855 A1 20001108; AU 3548300 A 20001121; EP 1181672 A1 20020227; TW 446920 B 20010721; WO 0068899 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI