Global patent index - EP 1050861 A2

EP 1050861 A2 2000-11-08 - Method for transmitting an emergency call

Title (en)

Method for transmitting an emergency call

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Absetzen einer Notfallmeldung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la transmission d'un appel de détresse

Publication

EP 1050861 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108713 A

Priority

DE 19920502 A

Abstract (en)

In an emergency a test is made to see if at least one device is still able to detect sound (17) or other devices (12.1-12.4) can detect sound re-radiation. The result of a function test is passed on to a remote station along with an emergency message. This ensures that the remote station is aware of the condition of these detecting devices. The remote station then converts this to use still available devices for purposeful communication.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befasst sich mit einem Verfahren zum Absetzen einer Notfallmeldung, insbesondere mit der Verbesserung solcher Verfahren. Gemäß dem Stand der Technik ist es bekannt, dass Notfallmeldungen automatisch bei Eintritt einer Notfalllage an eine Gegenstelle übermittelt werden und/oder versucht wird, einen Sprachkontakt mit den Personen herzustellen, die von dem Notfall betroffen sind. Da nicht ausgeschlossen werden kann, dass in einer Notfallsituation eine Beschädigung von Anordnungen zur Schallerfassung 17 und/oder Schallabstrahlung 12 eintritt und somit die als vorteilhaft erkannte Kommunikation mit der (legenstelle zumindest teilweise ausgeschlossen ist, bestand das Bedürfnis ein Verfahren anzugeben, welches die nach einem Notfall noch vorhandenen Anordnungen optimal nur Kommunikationsaufnahme nutzt. Diese Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, dass nach Auslösung des Notfalls zunächst geprüft wird, ob wenigstens eine Anordnung zur Schallerfassung 17 und/oder wenigstens eine Anordnung zur Schallabstrahlung 12 noch funktionsfähig ist, und dass neben der Notfallmeldung auch das Ergebnis der Funktionsprüfung an die Gegenstelle übermittelt wird. Hierdurch wird sichergestellt, dass die Gegenstelle vom Zustand der Anordnungen zur Schallabstrahlung 12 bzw. Schallerfassung 17 Kenntnis erhält. Diese Kenntnis versetzt dann die Gegenstelle in beispielsweise die Lage, die noch vorhandenen Anordnungen zur zweckgerechten Kommunikation zu verwenden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01; G08B 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/205 (2013.01); G08B 25/016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050861 A2 20001108; EP 1050861 A3 20010530; EP 1050861 B1 20020703; DE 19920502 A1 20001109; US 6388570 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060422

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060422

2005-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050420

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000253

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-08

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI