Global Patent Index - EP 1050890 A2

EP 1050890 A2 2000-11-08 - Electromagnet with a stack of laminations

Title (en)

Electromagnet with a stack of laminations

Title (de)

Elektromagnet mit einem Blechpaket

Title (fr)

Electroaimant avec un paquet de tôles

Publication

EP 1050890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107464 A

Priority

DE 19920094 A

Abstract (en)

The electromagnet includes a housing (4) accommodating a laminated armature (1) comprising a stack of laminations (3) and a winding. The laminated armature is molded in the housing and comprises undercuts (5) filled with housing casting material. Each the laminations may have similarly located undercuts. The undercuts may be formed as open sectors (5a) in the edge regions of th laminations, or as holes in projections from the edge regions of the laminations. A binding layer may be applied before molding.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Elektromagnet, insbesondere für einen elektromagnetischen Aktuator zur Betätigung eines Gaswechsel-Hubventiles einer Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem Blechpaket, welches aus einer Vielzahl von aufeinander gestapelten Blechlamellen aufgebaut ist, eine Spule trägt und in einem Gehäuse angeordnet ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Blechpaket in das Gehäuse eingegossen und weist vom Gehäuse-Gußmaterial ausgefüllte Hinterschnitte auf. Somit werden die Blechlamellen untereinander und das Blechpaket im Gehäuse einfach und sicher fixiert. Dabei kann jede der Blechlamellen des Blechpaktes insbesondere gleich angeordnete Hinterschnitte aufweisen, es können aber auch nur einige der Blechlamellen ggf. in Zusammenwirken mit anderen Blechlamellen Hinterschnitte bilden, wobei die Blechlamellen ansonsten anderweitig miteinander verbunden sind, insbesondere durch Stanzpaketierung. Angegeben sind verschiedene Ausführungsformen für die genannten Hinterschnitte. Zusätzlich zur formschlüssigen Verbindung kann noch eine stoffschlüssige Verbindung vorgesehen sein, wozu das Blechpaket vor dem Eingießen in das Gehäuse mit einer geeigenten Verbindungsschicht versehen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/08; H01F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/02 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/02 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050890 A2 20001108; EP 1050890 A3 20010912; EP 1050890 B1 20081224; DE 19920094 A1 20001109; DE 50015495 D1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160406

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160406

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50015495

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-12-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015495

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-02-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI