Global Patent Index - EP 1050922 A2

EP 1050922 A2 2000-11-08 - Antenna arrangement with two operating frequency bands

Title (en)

Antenna arrangement with two operating frequency bands

Title (de)

Antennenanordnung mit zwei Arbeitsfrequenzbändern

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'antennes à deux bandes de fréquences de l'opération

Publication

EP 1050922 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660083 A

Priority

FI 991043 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna arrangement comprises a radiating antenna element (101), feed point (304, 703, 804) for connecting the radiating antenna element to a radio apparatus, and a ground plane (303, 705, 808). There is between the feed point and ground plane a certain shortest distance which is substantially greater than 1.5 mm. The antenna arrangement has two different operating frequency bands. Preferably the construction comprises an electrically conductive connecting component (105, 603, 801) for connecting the radiating antenna element to the feed point, a functional part (110, 809) in the radio apparatus for transmitting and receiving electromagnetic radiation through an antenna, and a transmission line (306, 604, 605) for providing an electrical connection between the connecting component and the functional part in the radio apparatus. The transmission line comprises in succession a first portion (307, 604) and a second portion (308, 605) such that the longer the distance between a given reference point in the first portion and the interface between the first portion and second portion, the greater the shortest distance between the reference point and the ground plane, and the shortest distance between a given reference point in the second portion and the ground plane is independent of the distance between the reference point and said interface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/36; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/362 (2013.01); H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 5/357 (2013.01); H01Q 5/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050922 A2 20001108; EP 1050922 A3 20031008; CN 1273441 A 20001115; FI 991043 A0 19990506; FI 991043 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040124

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI