Global patent index - EP 1050929 A1

EP 1050929 A1 2000-11-08 - Terminal for electrical apparatus for removable clamping of cables

Title (en)

Terminal for electrical apparatus for removable clamping of cables

Title (de)

Anschlusskontakt für Elektrogeräte zur lösbaren Verbindung von Kabeln

Title (fr)

Borne d'un appareillage électrique pour le serrage amovible des câbles

Publication

EP 1050929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107374 A

Priority

DE 19920245 A

Abstract (en)

The contact has a U-shaped contact body (1) with legs and with a leaf spring held (2) in its legs. The position of the leaf spring w.r.t. a cable inserted into the contact body is changed by an ejector element (5) operated from the outside. The legs ma have openings for receiving the leaf spring. The openings may be formed from a trapezoidal section. The leaf spring may be T-sha In its initial position, the ejector element lies against the leaf spring in its rest position. In a spring relieving position, is displaced under the spring.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Anschlußkontakt für Elektrogeräte zur lösbaren Verbindung von Kabeln, wobei in einem Anschlußkörper eine Blattfeder vorgespannt geklemmt fixiert ist, welche die eingeführten Kabel in ihrer Positionierung auf dem Kontaktkörperboden festhält. Über ein Ausstoßerelement, welches in den Kontaktkörper hinein bewegt wird und welches die Blattfeder um ihren Rastbereich abwinkelt, können die Kabel aus ihrer kraftschlüssigen Fixierung gelöst werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58; H02G 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4836 (2013.01); H01R 13/5804 (2013.01); H01R 13/5816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 3305767 A1 19840830 - KALTHOFF GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050929 A1 20001108; EP 1050929 B1 20050713; DE 19920245 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50010692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50010692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI