Global Patent Index - EP 1050966 A2

EP 1050966 A2 2000-11-08 - Control circuit for an actuator

Title (en)

Control circuit for an actuator

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Steuern eines Aktuators

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande d'un actionneur

Publication

EP 1050966 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00200849 A

Priority

DE 19911863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911863A1] A first control path includes a series connected a first current control element (4) and a first bypass element (6) controlling a power supply for an actuator (7). The latter in its first connection is connected between the first current control element (5) and the first bypass element (6) and in its second connections it is connected with a first pole of a source (1) connected at the first bypass element (6). An Independent claim is included for: (a) an adjustment system for operating an adjustment device in IC engine

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Schaltungsanordnung zum Steuern eines Aktuators mit einer im wesentlichen eine Gleichspannung abgebenden Quelle zum Zuführen elektrischer Energie zum Aktuator, einem ersten Steuerpfad, der eine mit ihren Endanschlüssen an Pole der Quelle angeschlossene Reihenschaltung aus einem zur Energiezufuhr an den Aktuator steuerbaren ersten Stromsteuerelement und einem ersten Freilaufelement umfasst, wobei der Aktuator mit einem ersten seiner Anschlüsse an einen ersten Verbindungspunkt zwischen dem ersten Stromsteuerelement und dem ersten Freilaufelement angeschlossen und mit einem zweiten seiner Anschlüsse mit dem an das erste Freilaufelement angeschlossenen ersten Pol der Quelle gekoppelt ist. Eine solche Schaltungsanordnung ist sehr einfach aufgebaut und damit kostengünstig und betriebssicher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 17/082; H03K 17/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/18 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); H02K 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911863 A1 20000921; EP 1050966 A2 20001108; EP 1050966 A3 20020130; EP 1050966 B1 20041103; JP 2000323325 A 20001124

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-04 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50008468

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-10-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50008468

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008468 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLTE, EKKEHARD,PHILIPS INTEL.PROP.&STANDARS G

2004-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALFMANN, JUERGEN,PHILIPS INTELL.PROP.& STAND.G

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 03K 17/082 A, 7H 03K 17/64 B, 7F 02D 9/10 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI