Global Patent Index - EP 1050984 A1

EP 1050984 A1 2000-11-08 - Alternative frequency strategy for DRM

Title (en)

Alternative frequency strategy for DRM

Title (de)

Alternative Frequenz Strategie für DRM

Title (fr)

Stratégie fréquence alternative pour la DRM

Publication

EP 1050984 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99109102 A

Priority

EP 99109102 A

Abstract (en)

A radio transmission signal consisting of signal frames that comprise a dynamic data part and a quasi-static data part according to the present invention is characterized in that the dynamic data part of a respective frame contains an indicator showing in which following frame the quasi-static data part of this respective frame will be repeated. Therewith, an alternative frequency of e. g. a digital shortwave signal like a DRM signal can easily and satisfactorily be checked before a fast seamless switching to this alternative frequency can be performed. The inventive method to perform a seamless switching of a receiver from a first currently tuned frequency to a second alternative frequency is characterized by the step of receiving at least one set of samples from a respective signal transmitted on at least one second frequency during a time period during which said indicator assures that it is secure that only data that has been transmitted at least once is transmitted as signal on said first frequency to gather some information about said alternative frequency. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0689307 A1 19951227 - NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] GB 2247121 A 19920219 - PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]
  • [Y] "DAB-EMPFANGSTECHNIK", FUNKSCHAU, vol. 67, no. 11, 12 May 1995 (1995-05-12), pages 36 - 39, XP000517147, ISSN: 0016-2841

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CY DE FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1050984 A1 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060718

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CY DE FI FR GB IT NL

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE FI FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI