Global patent index - EP 1051015 A2

EP 1051015 A2 2000-11-08 - Dictation function in a cellular telephone

Title (en)

Dictation function in a cellular telephone

Title (de)

Diktier-Funktion in einem zellularen Telefon

Title (fr)

Fonctionnalité de dictée dans un téléphone cellulaire

Publication

EP 1051015 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303458 A

Priority

US 30344399 A

Abstract (en)

A wireless telephone dictation device includes a dictation mode in addition to an otherwise conventional wireless telephone mode. The dictation functionality of the wireless telephone dictation device is inconspicuous to those around the user of the device, and appears as if the device is a conventional wireless telephone. In a dictation mode, the wireless telephone dictation device records verbal passages from a user into an appropriate digital memory (or onto an analog cassette tape), under the control of buttons resembling those of a conventional wireless telephone (e.g., using various number keys of a twelve (12) digit alphanumeric keypad). The wireless telephone dictation device operates in an otherwise conventional fashion in a wireless telephone mode, allowing conventional wireless telephone (e.g., cellular telephone) functionality. A speech-to-text converter can be included to convert recorded verbal passages into text for display on an appropriate display. Preferably, the text display resembles that of a conventional wireless telephone. The wireless capability of the wireless telephone dictation device may be utilized to allow transfer of recorded dictation between wireless telephone dictation devices, or between a wireless telephone dictation device and a land-based dictation database. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/725; H04M 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/656 (2006.01); H04M 1/658 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04M 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/656 (2013.01); H04M 1/7255 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051015 A2 20001108; EP 1051015 A3 20040107; JP 2001119474 A 20010427

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061101

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/725 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/27 B

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI