Global Patent Index - EP 1051070 A1

EP 1051070 A1 2000-11-15 - WATER-DISPERSIBLE FLAKE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

WATER-DISPERSIBLE FLAKE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

WASSERDISPERGIERBARE FLOCKEN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE FLOCONS DISPERSIBLES DANS L'EAU

Publication

EP 1051070 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934202 A

Priority

  • GB 9900282 W
  • US 1782198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939577A1] A water-dispersible flake comprises a plurality of microcapsules or microparticles containing one or more encapsulated ingredients, for example a pesticide such as a herbicide or an insecticide, wherein the microcapsules or microparticles are held together in flake form by spacer material such as a nonencapsulated pesticide and/or one or more surfactants. The flake may be prepared by (a) mixing an aqueous suspension of the microcapsules or microparticles with spacer material and/or a surfactant to form a dispersion (b) drying the dispersion by thin-layer drying on a heated surface and (c) removing the dried product of step (b) from the heated surface to form flakes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 25/34; A01N 25/28; A01N 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/28 (2006.01); A01N 25/34 (2006.01); A01N 37/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/34 (2013.01); A01N 25/28 (2013.01); A01N 37/36 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 37/26 + A01N 25/34 + A01N 25/28
  2. A01N 37/36 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939577A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939577 A1 19990812; AR 019526 A1 20020227; AU 4480699 A 19990823; BG 104661 A 20011031; BR 9908781 A 20020115; CN 1292640 A 20010425; EE 200000456 A 20011217; EP 1051070 A1 20001115; GE P20022781 B 20020211; GT 199900016 A 20000728; HR P20000526 A2 20010630; HU 0100736 A2 20010628; HU 0100736 A3 20040301; IL 137682 D0 20011031; JO 2094 B 20000521; NO 20003938 A 20000921; NO 20003938 D0 20000803; PE 02422000 A1 20000407; SK 11732000 A3 20011106; TR 200002643 T2 20001121; YU 50300 A 20030228; ZA 9900768 B 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE