Global Patent Index - EP 1051121 A1

EP 1051121 A1 2000-11-15 - UMBILICAL CORD CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

UMBILICAL CORD CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

NABELSTRANGKLEMME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PINCEMENT DU CORDON OMBILICAL

Publication

EP 1051121 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904808 A

Priority

US 9801886 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/122 (2006.01); A61B 17/128 (2006.01); A61B 17/42 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051121 A1 20001115; EP 1051121 A4 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/42 A, 7A 61B 17/128 B, 7A 61B 17/122 B

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HESSEL, STEPHEN, R.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATZ, MICHAEL

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE