Global Patent Index - EP 1051121 A4

EP 1051121 A4 2001-02-28 - UMBILICAL CORD CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

UMBILICAL CORD CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

NABELSTRANGKLEMME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PINCEMENT DU CORDON OMBILICAL

Publication

EP 1051121 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98904808 A

Priority

US 9801886 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/42; A61B 17/122; A61B 17/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/122 (2006.01); A61B 17/128 (2006.01); A61B 17/42 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051121 A1 20001115; EP 1051121 A4 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050802

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61B 17/42 A, 7A 61B 17/128 B, 7A 61B 17/122 B

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HESSEL, STEPHEN, R.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATZ, MICHAEL

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE