Global Patent Index - EP 1051141 A1

EP 1051141 A1 2000-11-15 - AMYLIN AGONIST PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING INSULIN

Title (en)

AMYLIN AGONIST PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING INSULIN

Title (de)

INSULIN HALTIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EINEN AMYLINAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A AGONISTE D'AMYLINE, CONTENANT DE L'INSULINE

Publication

EP 1051141 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902526 A

Priority

US 9800662 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/28 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 5916298 A 19990726; EP 1051141 A1 20001115; EP 1051141 A4 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030360

2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031029

2001-05-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/00 A, 7A 61K 38/28 B, 7A 61K 38/28 J, 7A 61K 38:22 J

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: L'ITALIAN, JAMES

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUSUNURI, SHANKAR

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUBY, CALE

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLTERMAN, ORVILLE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990806

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE