Global Patent Index - EP 1051141 A4

EP 1051141 A4 2001-05-23 - AMYLIN AGONIST PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING INSULIN

Title (en)

AMYLIN AGONIST PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING INSULIN

Title (de)

INSULIN HALTIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EINEN AMYLINAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A AGONISTE D'AMYLINE, CONTENANT DE L'INSULINE

Publication

EP 1051141 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98902526 A

Priority

US 9800662 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00; A61K 38/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/28 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] US 5124314 A 19920623 - COOPER GARTH J S [US]
  • [X] REDALIEU E ET AL: "Pharmacokinetic effects of syringe mixing pramlintide, isophane insulin, and soluble insulin.", DIABETOLOGIA, vol. 40, no. Suppl. 1, 1997, 16th International Diabetes Federation Congress; Helsinki; 20-25 July 1997, pages A356, XP000990750

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 5916298 A 19990726; EP 1051141 A1 20001115; EP 1051141 A4 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030360

2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031029

2001-05-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/00 A, 7A 61K 38/28 B, 7A 61K 38/28 J, 7A 61K 38:22 J

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: L'ITALIAN, JAMES

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUSUNURI, SHANKAR

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUBY, CALE

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOLTERMAN, ORVILLE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990806

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE