Global patent index - EP 1051188 A1

EP 1051188 A1 2000-11-15 - MUCOSAL DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING LIPOPHILIC THROMBIN INHIBITORS

Title (en)

MUCOSAL DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING LIPOPHILIC THROMBIN INHIBITORS

Title (de)

MUKOSALE ABGABEFORMULIERUNGEN ENTHALTEND LIPOPHILIE THROMBININHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION PAR LES MUQUEUSES COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE THROMBINE LIPOPHILE

Publication

EP 1051188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958993 A

Priority

  • GB 9803511 W
  • GB 9724786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926652A1] A composition for the delivery across a mucosal surface of a lipophilic thrombin inhibitor comprising a lipophilic thrombin inhibitor and a non-ionic surfactant. Preferably, the mucosal surface is in the gastrointestinal tract, nose, mouth, rectum or vagina. Advantageously, the thrombin inhibitor is a peptide boronic acid or ester derivative thereof. Conveniently, the non-ionic surfactant is an ethoxylated glyceride. Suitably, the composition is contained within a capsule. In addition, the invention also relates to methods of making said compositions and the use of said compositions in medicine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/55; A61K 31/69; A61K 47/06; A61K 47/14; A61K 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/38 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 47/14 (2013.01); A61K 47/26 (2013.01); A61K 47/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926652A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926652 A1 19990603; AU 1493499 A 19990615; AU 739270 B2 20011011; CA 2310775 A1 19990603; EP 1051188 A1 20001115; GB 9724786 D0 19980121; JP 2001523728 A 20011127; NO 20002647 A 20000524; NO 20002647 D0 20000524

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-04-28 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19F

- Effective date: 20040601

2002-03-13 [19A] DATE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19A

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/55 A, 7A 61K 31/69 B, 7A 61K 47/34 B

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/55 A, 7A 61K 31/69 B, 7A 61K 47/34 B

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE