Global Patent Index - EP 1051225 A1

EP 1051225 A1 2000-11-15 - SKI, ESPECIALLY AN ALPINE SKI

Title (en)

SKI, ESPECIALLY AN ALPINE SKI

Title (de)

SCHI, INSBESONDERE ALPINSCHI

Title (fr)

SKI, NOTAMMENT SKI ALPIN

Publication

EP 1051225 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99901498 A

Priority

  • AT 9900021 W
  • AT 16098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938583A1] The invention relates to a ski (2), especially an alpine ski, comprising several layers arranged between a gliding surface and a cover layer, which form at least one sandwich element (7) in conjunction with a core arranged in-between the layers. The ski also comprises a fixing element (54, 55) arranged therein to fix a ski binding (6). The fixing element (54, 55) is arranged in a neutral layer -plane (58)- of the ski (2) when the latter is bent perpendicular to the gliding surface (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938583 A1 19990805; WO 9938583 A8 19991028; AT 229361 T 20021215; AT 315430 T 20060215; AT 408950 B 20020425; AT A16098 A 20010915; AU 2142299 A 19990816; DE 59903733 D1 20030123; DE 59913028 D1 20060406; EP 1051225 A1 20001115; EP 1051225 B1 20021211; EP 1245254 A2 20021002; EP 1245254 A3 20030820; EP 1245254 B1 20060111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH

- Free text: ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH#LACKENGASSE 301#5541 ALTENMARKT IM PONGAU (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ATOMIC AUSTRIA GMBH#LACKENGASSE 301#5541 ALTENMARKT IM PONGAU (AT)

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABP PATENT NETWORK SWISS GMBH

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903733 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229361 T 20021215

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000729

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI