Global Patent Index - EP 1051260 A1

EP 1051260 A1 2000-11-15 - METHOD FOR REGULATING CENTRIFUGES FOR DEHYDRATING WASTEWATER SLUDGE, USING FUZZY LOGIC

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING CENTRIFUGES FOR DEHYDRATING WASTEWATER SLUDGE, USING FUZZY LOGIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGLUNG VON ZENTRIFUGEN FÜR DIE ENTWÄSSERUNG VON ABFALLWASSERSCHLÄMMEN UNTER BENUTZUNG VON FUZZY-LOGIC

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE CENTRIFUGEUSES POUR LA DESHYDRATATION DES BOUES D'EPURATION, METTANT EN OEUVRE LA LOGIQUE FLOUE

Publication

EP 1051260 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954506 A

Priority

  • FR 9802349 W
  • FR 9715166 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771659A1] The invention concerns a method for regulating a centrifuge used for solid/liquid separation in particular for dehydrating wastewater sludge which consists in: (A) measuring as input variables: the suspended matter content (MeS) of the clear effluent; the sludge, Db and the reagent Dp (polymer) flow rates; in the case of conventional centrifuges, the value of the couple CPL (which represents the amount of sludge present in the machine); in the case of intensive centrifuges, the relative speed VR which represents the sludge retention time in the centrifuge) and optionally the value of the couple CPL. (B) locating the operating point resulting from the previous measurements in the operating ranges which constitute characteristic spaces where by acting on the sludge (Db) and reagent (Dp) flow rates it is possible to bring the centrifuge operating point into a space considered to be a stable and optimal operating space for the centrifuge; and (C) depending on the results of the treatment of the inputs on the sludge (Db) flow rate, acting at the input of the centrifuge and/or on the reagent (Dp) flow rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 13/00; B04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01); B04B 11/02 (2006.01); B04B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2013.01); B04B 11/02 (2013.01); B04B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928040A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771659 A1 19990604; FR 2771659 B1 20000211; AU 1158999 A 19990616; AU 749997 B2 20020704; CA 2312858 A1 19990610; DE 1051260 T1 20010523; EP 1051260 A1 20001115; ES 2151469 T1 20010101; JP 2001524382 A 20011204; NZ 504619 A 20030630; US 6549817 B1 20030415; WO 9928040 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021124

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ONDEO DEGREMONT

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-05-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-02-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151469 T1

2000-11-22 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT