Global Patent Index - EP 1051268 A1

EP 1051268 A1 2000-11-15 - TUBE BENDING MACHINE AND MAGAZINE DEVICE THEREOF

Title (en)

TUBE BENDING MACHINE AND MAGAZINE DEVICE THEREOF

Title (de)

ROHRBIEGEVORRICHTUNG UND SEINEN TROMMELEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE A CINTRER LES TUBES ET SON DISPOSITIF A BARILLET

Publication

EP 1051268 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958951 A

Priority

  • FR 9802606 W
  • FR 9801315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774317A1] The invention concerns a tube bending machine comprising on the bending arm (4) a magazine device (12) bearing clamping jaws (14) with different impressions, said magazine device being capable of pivoting simultaneously with the bending arm (4) about the bending head (3) for forming the tubes (8), while the magazine device (12) can rotate about its own longitudinal axis and along directions included in planes perpendicular and/or parallel to the plane containing the fixed frame (2) longitudinal axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/02; B21D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/14 (2013.01); B21D 7/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774317 A1 19990806; FR 2774317 B1 20000407; CA 2318385 A1 19990805; CA 2318385 C 20060523; DE 69805550 D1 20020627; DE 69805550 T2 20030109; EP 1051268 A1 20001115; EP 1051268 B1 20020522; US 6345525 B1 20020212; WO 9938626 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-12-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131204

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130102

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69805550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-27

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010619

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE