Global Patent Index - EP 1051269 A1

EP 1051269 A1 2000-11-15 - DEVICE FOR ALIGNING A BAND, ESPECIALLY A METAL BAND

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ALIGNING A BAND, ESPECIALLY A METAL BAND

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN EINES BANDES, INSBESONDERE EINES METALLBANDES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR CENTRER UNE BANDE, EN PARTICULIER UNE BANDE METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1051269 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98964461 A

Priority

  • DE 19753052 A
  • EP 9807710 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19753052A1] The invention relates to a device for aligning a band (B), especially a metal band, having a guiding roller (14) which extends over the width of the band (B). Said guiding roller (14) is provided in order to lead the band (B) to a processing station which follows in a conveying direction (F). To this end, a deflection device (20) is arranged next to the guiding roller (14). The deflection device (20) can be brought into contact with the band (B) and is configured in the area of its contact surfaces, said surfaces contacting the band (B), in such a way that an aligning movement of the band (b) is made possible, said direction being aligned such that it is essentially perpendicular to the conveying direction (F). In addition, the position of the deflection device (20) and the guiding roller (14) can be varied relative to one another such that the band (B) is lifted off by the guiding roller (14) when the band (B) and the deflection device (20) are in contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/02; B23K 37/04; B23Q 7/18; B65H 23/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/14 (2006.01); B21B 41/08 (2006.01); B65H 23/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 41/08 (2013.01); B21B 39/14 (2013.01); B65H 23/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928063A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19753052 A1 19990610; EP 1051269 A1 20001115; EP 1051269 B1 20020821; WO 9928063 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-08-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUNDWIG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20081130

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-02-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805262 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI GB IT SE

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI GB IT SE