Global Patent Index - EP 1051330 A1

EP 1051330 A1 2000-11-15 - AN IMPROVED BOTTOM PROFILE FOR A CAN

Title (en)

AN IMPROVED BOTTOM PROFILE FOR A CAN

Title (de)

BODENKONTUR FÜR EINE DOSE

Title (fr)

PROFIL PERFECTIONNE DE FOND DE BOITE A BOISSON

Publication

EP 1051330 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97922935 A

Priority

EP 9702241 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849065A1] A thin metal pressure-resistant can comprising a can body having a deep-drawn and wall-ironed cylindrical side wall, the can body comprising an outwardly convexed bottom integrally with said body and an inwardly projecting dome.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849065A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849065 A1 19981105; AT 232813 T 20030315; AU 2889997 A 19981124; BR 9714701 A 20000613; DE 69719228 D1 20030327; DE 69719228 T2 20031120; DK 1051330 T3 20030616; EP 1051330 A1 20001115; EP 1051330 B1 20030219; ES 2192270 T3 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040430

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORUS STAAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040429

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY

2004-01-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192270 T3

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030507

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030414

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030414

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030411

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69719228 P 20030327

2003-03-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE