Global patent index - EP 1051347 A2

EP 1051347 A2 2000-11-15 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING PEOPLE, PREFERABLY INCLUDING BICYCLES AND/OR WHEEL CHAIRS, AND/OR PASSENGER CARS AND/OR CARGO TRUCKS AND/OR FOR TRANSPORTING OBJECTS AND/OR MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING PEOPLE, PREFERABLY INCLUDING BICYCLES AND/OR WHEEL CHAIRS, AND/OR PASSENGER CARS AND/OR CARGO TRUCKS AND/OR FOR TRANSPORTING OBJECTS AND/OR MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON PERSONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNES, DE PREFERENCE AVEC DES BICYCLETTES ET/OU DES FAUTEUILS ROULANTS ET/OU DES VOITURES PARTICULIERES ET/OU DES VEHICULES UTILITAIRES, ET/OU POUR LE TRANSPORT D'OBJETS ET/OU DE MATERIAUX

Publication

EP 1051347 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99908758 A

Priority

  • DE 9900270 W
  • DE 19803610 A
  • DE 19806802 A
  • DE 19827037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938790A2] The invention relates to a method and device for transporting people, preferably including bicycles and/or wheel chairs, and/or passenger cars and/or cargo trucks and/or for transporting objects and/or material along a travel way. The invention comprises at least one curved traveling section, preferably at least one essentially vertical traveling section, and preferably at least one essentially horizontal or sloping traveling section. The invention is especially provided for bypassing travel ways at a height which does not obstruct traffic. The invention uses a transporting unit, especially in the form of a cabin (21) and/or of a transporting platform which can continuously travel throughout on stationary rails (70, 71, 72, 73, 74) which extend continuously and throughout along the travel way. The transporting unit can travel at a high traveling velocity in a to-and-fro manner between a first station (1, 2) located on one side of the travel ways which are to be bypassed and a second station (1, 2) located on the other side of the travel ways.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/02 (2006.01); B66B 9/00 (2006.01); B66B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/022 (2013.01); B66B 9/00 (2013.01); B66B 9/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938790A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938790 A2 19990805; WO 9938790 A3 20000908; AT 228962 T 20021215; AU 2825399 A 19990816; DE 19980122 D2 20010118; DE 29980011 U1 20010118; EP 1051347 A2 20001115; EP 1051347 B1 20021204; ES 2189396 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140202

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 228962

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHMID, EMIL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1051347E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189396

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903645

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 228962

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING PEOPLE AND/OR GOODS ALONG A PATH INCLUDING VERTICAL AND CURVED SECTIONS

2002-05-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING PEOPLE AND/OR GOODS ALONG A PATH INCLUDING VERTICAL AND CURVED SECTIONS

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING PEOPLE AND/OR GOODS ALONG A PATH INCLUDING VERTICAL AND CURVED SECTIONS

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE