Global Patent Index - EP 1051474 A1

EP 1051474 A1 2000-11-15 - MULTIPHASE DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (en)

MULTIPHASE DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (de)

MEHRPHASIGE WASCHMITTELTABLETTEN

Title (fr)

COMPRIMES DETERGENTS A PHASES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1051474 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954379 A

Priority

  • CA 2313227 A
  • DE 19803410 A
  • EP 9806403 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803410A1] Detergent tablets, consisting of compressed detergent particles comprising surfactant(s), builder(s) and optionally other detergent ingredients, have two or more discrete phases in which the surfactant content varies by no more than 3 wt.% based on the weight of the individual phases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938948A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803410 A1 19990729; CA 2313227 A1 20001008; EP 1051474 A1 20001115; EP 1051474 B1 20040211; JP 2002501977 A 20020122; WO 9938948 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-07-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-07-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071003

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20041105

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810765 P 20040318

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL