Global Patent Index - EP 1051481 A1

EP 1051481 A1 2000-11-15 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT POUR ELLES

Publication

EP 1051481 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905538 A

Priority

  • US 9901955 W
  • US 7309598 P
  • US 23784799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938959A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/435; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938959 A1 19990805; AU 2567999 A 19990816; CA 2318911 A1 19990805; EP 1051481 A1 20001115; EP 1051481 A4 20021104; JP 2002507390 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/00 A, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 07K 14/00 B, 7C 07K 14/435 B, 7C 12N 15/86 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B

2002-11-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOBS, KENNETH

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCCOY, JOHN, M.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAVALLIE, EDWARD, R.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COLLINS-RACIE, LISA, A.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EVANS, CHERYL

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MERBERG, DAVID

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TREACY, MAURICE

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE