Global Patent Index - EP 1051504 A2

EP 1051504 A2 2000-11-15 - RIBOFLAVIN BIOSYNTHESIS GENES FROM PLANTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

RIBOFLAVIN BIOSYNTHESIS GENES FROM PLANTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

GENE DER RIBOFLAVINBIOSYNTHESE AUS PFLANZEN UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

GENES DE BIOSYNTHESE DE LA RIBOFLAVINE EXTRAITS DE PLANTES ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1051504 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99907444 A

Priority

  • EP 9900556 W
  • US 10981098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938986A2] The present invention provides plant riboflavin biosynthesis genes, including a gene that encodes the beta subunit of the plant riboflavin synthase enzyme complex (lumazine synthase) and a gene that encodes the bifunctional enzyme GTP cyclohydrolase II/DHBP synthase. Also disclosed are the recombinant production of these plant riboflavin biosynthesis enzymes in heterologous hosts, screening chemicals for herbicidal activity using these recombinantly produced enzymes, and the use of thereby identified herbicidal chemicals to suppress the growth of undesired vegetation. Furthermore, the present invention provides methods for the development of herbicide tolerance in plants, plant tissues, plant seeds and plant cells using the riboflavin biosynthesis genes of the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/10; C12N 9/14; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/55; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/14 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12N 15/55 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1085 (2013.01); C12N 9/14 (2013.01); C12N 15/8243 (2013.01); C12N 15/8274 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938986A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938986 A2 19990805; WO 9938986 A3 19990923; AU 2720299 A 19990816; AU 744487 B2 20020228; BR 9908213 A 20001128; CA 2318522 A1 19990805; CN 1289369 A 20010328; CZ 20002750 A3 20001115; EP 1051504 A2 20001115; HU 0101278 A2 20010828; HU 0101278 A3 20030428; ID 25910 A 20001109; IL 137303 D0 20010724; IN 209CH2000 A 20050520; JP 2002501753 A 20020122; KR 20010082509 A 20010830; MX PA00007432 A 20010201; PL 342805 A1 20010702; TR 200002193 T2 20010521; ZA 9900716 B 19990730

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033837

2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA AG.

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA AG.

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA AG.

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA AG.

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE