Global Patent Index - EP 1051507 A1

EP 1051507 A1 2000-11-15 - ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC CELLS, METHODS OF GENERATING THESE CELLS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC CELLS, METHODS OF GENERATING THESE CELLS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ANTIGEN-SPEZIFISCHE ZELLEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

CELLULES SPECIFIQUES D'ANTIGENES, PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1051507 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902434 A

Priority

  • US 9901462 W
  • US 12205398 P
  • US 8003698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937797A1] The present invention provides methods for identifying antigens recognized by immune effector cells. In one embodiment, the methods combine identifying amino acid sequence motifs of such antigens and the DNA sequences that potentially encode the identified amino acid motifs and the DNA sequences which are aberrantly expressed in the cells. By comparison of these sequences, novel antigens that are recognized by immune effector cells are identified.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 19/34; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/11; C12P 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6811 (2013.01); C12N 15/1072 (2013.01); C12N 15/1079 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937797 A1 19990729; AU 2241499 A 19990809; AU 761256 B2 20030529; CA 2318979 A1 19990729; EP 1051507 A1 20001115; EP 1051507 A4 20030205; JP 2002500891 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070208

2003-02-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 19/34 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/00 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/11 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/06 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/10 B

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE