Global Patent Index - EP 1051526 A1

EP 1051526 A1 2000-11-15 - DEVICE FOR GUIDING BANDS IN A SUSPENDED MANNER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR GUIDING BANDS IN A SUSPENDED MANNER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHWEBENDEN FÜHRUNG VON BÄNDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE GUIDAGE PAR SUSTENTATION DE BANDES

Publication

EP 1051526 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904850 A

Priority

  • DE 19804184 A
  • EP 9900698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804184A1] The invention relates to a device for guiding bands in a suspended manner and for stabilizing bands, preferably wide metal bands, for the purpose of heat treating the same. In the device, the band is blown on both sides with the aid of suspended nozzle sections, and two respective radial ventilators with 360 DEG spiral casings are arranged on the side walls of the device in the vicinity of both sides of the band. The intake openings of the radial ventilators point toward the middle of the device. The axes of the radial ventilators are vertical in relation to the side walls, and the radial ventilators are arranged in such a way that they deliver air into air delivery channels (6) from the length of at least one hydraulic diameter in a manner parallel to the longitudinal direction of the device, that is, in a direction of movement of the band. The air delivery channels (6) are adjacent to the upper casing (8) or the lower casing of the device via a side wall. Elbows are respectively connected to the air delivery channels (6). The volume stream delivered from said elbows by the radial ventilator enters a collecting receptacle which extends as at least one piece over the entire length of the device and which is provided with the nozzle section on the side facing the band, said nozzle field being approximately equal in width to that of the collecting receptacle. The gas stream blown on the band predominantly flows away and up to the longitudinal sides of the device and enters from the sides of the device into the suction area between the radial ventilators above and below the band (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/63; B65H 23/24; F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/63 (2006.01); F26B 13/20 (2006.01); B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/104 (2013.01); C21D 9/63 (2013.01); B21B 39/00 (2013.01); B21B 2045/0212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940230A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804184 A1 19990805; AT 208432 T 20011115; EP 1051526 A1 20001115; EP 1051526 B1 20011107; US 6413470 B1 20020702; WO 9940230 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900408 20011213

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208432 T 20011115

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT