Global Patent Index - EP 1051529 A1

EP 1051529 A1 2000-11-15 - NON-MAGNETIC CORROSION RESISTANT HIGH STRENGTH STEELS

Title (en)

NON-MAGNETIC CORROSION RESISTANT HIGH STRENGTH STEELS

Title (de)

NICHTMAGNETISCHER STAHL MIT HOHER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND HOHER FESTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ACIERS NON MAGNETIQUES HAUTE RESISTANCE, ANTICORROSION

Publication

EP 1051529 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946594 A

Priority

  • GB 9803029 W
  • GB 9723242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331103A] A first steel comprises 0-0.05 weight % carbon, 0-1.0 weight % silicon, 10.0-20.0 weight % manganese, 13.5-18.0 weight % chromium, 1.0-4.0 weight % nickel, 1.5-3.5 weight % molybdenum and 0.2-0.4 weight % nitrogen. A second steel comprises 0-0.2 weight % carbon, 0-1.0 weight % silicon, 10.0-20.0 weight % manganese, 13.5-18.0 weight % chromium, 1.0-7.0 weight % nickel, 1.5-4.0 weight % molybdenum and 0.2-0.4 weight % nitrogen where nickel equivalence/(chromium equivalence - 1À4) > 1.51 and nickel equivalence + chromium equivalence > 35. Such steels may be used as drill collars in oil and gas drills.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C22C 38/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923267A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331103 A 19990512; GB 9723242 D0 19980107; AT 210741 T 20011215; AU 9359698 A 19990524; BR 9813966 A 20000926; CA 2307570 A1 19990514; CA 2307570 C 20080826; DE 69802967 D1 20020124; DE 69802967 T2 20020912; DK 1051529 T3 20020408; EP 1051529 A1 20001115; EP 1051529 B1 20011212; ES 2169925 T3 20020716; NO 20002170 A 20000504; NO 20002170 D0 20000427; NO 334118 B1 20131216; WO 9923267 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161103

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169925

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802967

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 210741

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLVAC LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE