Global Patent Index - EP 1051529 B1

EP 1051529 B1 2001-12-12 - NON-MAGNETIC CORROSION RESISTANT HIGH STRENGTH STEELS

Title (en)

NON-MAGNETIC CORROSION RESISTANT HIGH STRENGTH STEELS

Title (de)

NICHTMAGNETISCHER STAHL MIT HOHER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND HOHER FESTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ACIERS NON MAGNETIQUES A HAUTE RESISTANCE MECANIQUE ET HAUTE RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION

Publication

EP 1051529 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946594 A

Priority

  • GB 9803029 W
  • GB 9723242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331103A] A first steel comprises 0-0.05 weight % carbon, 0-1.0 weight % silicon, 10.0-20.0 weight % manganese, 13.5-18.0 weight % chromium, 1.0-4.0 weight % nickel, 1.5-3.5 weight % molybdenum and 0.2-0.4 weight % nitrogen. A second steel comprises 0-0.2 weight % carbon, 0-1.0 weight % silicon, 10.0-20.0 weight % manganese, 13.5-18.0 weight % chromium, 1.0-7.0 weight % nickel, 1.5-4.0 weight % molybdenum and 0.2-0.4 weight % nitrogen where nickel equivalence/(chromium equivalence - 1À4) > 1.51 and nickel equivalence + chromium equivalence > 35. Such steels may be used as drill collars in oil and gas drills.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C22C 38/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331103 A 19990512; GB 9723242 D0 19980107; AT 210741 T 20011215; AU 9359698 A 19990524; BR 9813966 A 20000926; CA 2307570 A1 19990514; CA 2307570 C 20080826; DE 69802967 D1 20020124; DE 69802967 T2 20020912; DK 1051529 T3 20020408; EP 1051529 A1 20001115; EP 1051529 B1 20011212; ES 2169925 T3 20020716; NO 20002170 A 20000504; NO 20002170 D0 20000427; NO 334118 B1 20131216; WO 9923267 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169925 T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802967 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210741 T 20011215

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLVAC LTD.

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE