Global Patent Index - EP 1051533 B1

EP 1051533 B1 2002-11-06 - MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF TITANIUM ALLOY WATCH PARTS

Title (en)

MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF TITANIUM ALLOY WATCH PARTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON UHRENTEILEN AUS TITAN-LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PIECES DE MONTRE EN ALLIAGE DE TITANE

Publication

EP 1051533 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98900519 A

Priority

CH 9800028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937827A1] The invention concerns a watch part made of the following alloy (composition expressed in weight percentage): aluminium 5.5 to 6.75; vanadium 3.5 to 4.5; nitrogen 0.05 maximum; carbon 0.1 maximum; hydrogen 0.015 maximum; iron 0.4 maximum; oxygen 0.2 maximum; various elements: 0.1 maximum each, 0.5 maximum altogether, the remainder being titanium. Said alloy enables the part to be machined and polished with standard tools and provide it with a mirror-like shine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/18; G04B 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01); G04B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/18 (2013.01); G04B 37/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937827 A1 19990729; AU 5547398 A 19990809; CA 2318346 A1 19990729; DE 69809294 D1 20021212; DE 69809294 T2 20030821; EP 1051533 A1 20001115; EP 1051533 B1 20021106; ES 2183317 T3 20030316; JP 2002527611 A 20020827; TW 397940 B 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809294

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TAG HEUER SA

- Free text: TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH)

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029145

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TAG HEUER SA

- Free text: TAG-HEUER S.A.#14A, AVENUE DES CHAMPS-MONTANTS#2074 MARIN-EPAGNIER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- TAG HEUER SA#RUE LOUIS-JOSEPH-CHEVROLET 6A#2300 LA-CHAUX-DE-FONDS (CH)

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-09-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-01-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA, CH

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183317 T3

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA

2003-02-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-01-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809294 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF TITANIUM ALLOY WATCH PARTS

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL