Global Patent Index - EP 1051541 A2

EP 1051541 A2 2000-11-15 - METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY REGENERATING CONTAMINATED RHODIUM SOLUTIONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY REGENERATING CONTAMINATED RHODIUM SOLUTIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN REGENERATION VERUNREINIGTER RHODIUMLÖSUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGENERATION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE SOLUTIONS DE RHODIUM CONTAMINEES

Publication

EP 1051541 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99910109 A

Priority

  • DE 9900316 W
  • DE 19804534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804534C1] Impure rhodium solution is electrolytically regenerated by addition of alkali and anodic oxidation in a cell with a cation exchange membrane, through which impurities pass into a dilute acid catholyte. A contaminated rhodium solution is electrolytically regenerated by adjusting the pH to greater than 10 by addition of alkali and electrolyzing in a cell anode space (12), which is separated by a cation exchange membrane (16) from a cathode space (14) filled with a highly conductive dilute acid, at sufficiently high current densities for oxidizing trivalent rhodium to hexavalent rhodium and for impurity depletion through the membrane into the catholyte.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940238A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804534 C1 19990624; AT 209709 T 20011215; AU 2920599 A 19990823; EP 1051541 A2 20001115; EP 1051541 B1 20011128; HK 1034544 A1 20020524; WO 9940238 A2 19990812; WO 9940238 A3 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OBERFLACHENTECHNIK IN BERLIN G.M.B.H. & CO. OTB

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020322

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900461 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2001-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209709 T 20011215

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 25D 21/18 A

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE ELECTROLYTIC REGENERATION OF CONTAMINATED RHODIUM SOLUTIONS

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL