Global Patent Index - EP 1051556 A1

EP 1051556 A1 2000-11-15 - MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING SYSTEM WITH OPEN-ENDED CODE AND IDENTIFICATION

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING SYSTEM WITH OPEN-ENDED CODE AND IDENTIFICATION

Title (de)

ROLLIERENDES CODE-VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND IDENTIFIKATION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE A CODE EVOLUTIF ET IDENTIFICATION

Publication

EP 1051556 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99907432 A

Priority

  • EP 9900520 W
  • FR 9800982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774121A1] The vehicle key (30) contains a remote control module comprising a code transmitter (31) using typically infrared or low power radio and a separate key identification circuit (32). The code (Ci) is pseudo-randomly based on the number of times the key has been operated. In the automobile there is a code detector (10) which tracks the remote code and can operate the door locks. This detector connects through a data bus (B) to a key authentication device (20). When remote unlock is activated by a key user to unlock the vehicle, a security code is transmitted by the key. If the detector recognises the code then the doors are unblocked and vehicle functionality is enabled. If the code is not recognised, for instance when the evolving codes in the vehicle and the key become out of synchronisation, then the doors have to be manually unblocked and vehicle starting remains disabled. Under these circumstances, when the key is placed in the ignition switch the vehicle key authentication system communicates with the key identity circuit by means of some form of magnetic induction coupling. If the key is identified as valid, the code detect system resynchronises itself to the latest code received from the key, and vehicle functionality is enabled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00214 (2013.01); G07C 2009/0023 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00246 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); G07C 2209/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774121 A1 19990730; FR 2774121 B1 20000407; DE 69922345 D1 20050105; DE 69922345 T2 20050512; EP 1051556 A1 20001115; EP 1051556 B1 20041201; ES 2234242 T3 20050616; WO 9939066 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140126

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140127

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140126

2014-11-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69922345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140126

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69922345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2234242

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT